Global Patent Index - EP 1036626 A2

EP 1036626 A2 2000-09-20 - Reflow soldering method using a vacuum vapour-condensation soldering apparatus

Title (en)

Reflow soldering method using a vacuum vapour-condensation soldering apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reflow-Löten in einer Dampfphasenvakuumlötanlage

Title (fr)

Méthode de brasage par refusion utilisant un appareil de brasage en phase vapeur avec vide

Publication

EP 1036626 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104319 A

Priority

DE 19911887 A

Abstract (en)

Vapor phase reflow soldering process, comprises solder melting in an inert organic vapor and subjecting to vacuum in a zone above the vapor. Vapor phase reflow soldering process comprises: (a) introducing a workpiece into a closed unit through a lock chamber (11); (b) drying the workpiece in an ante-chamber (12); (c) transferring the workpiece into a reaction chamber (17) where it is heated using an inert organic medium vapor to above the solder melting point; (d) raising the hot workpiece into the zone above the vapor in the reaction chamber; (e) subjecting the hot workpiece to vacuum in a vessel (14) incorporated in the unit; (f) releasing the vacuum in the vessel (14) and cooling using a cooler incorporated in the vessel; and (g) discharging the workpiece from the unit through a lock chamber.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren für ein Reflow- Löten in einer Dampfphasenlötanlage mit einem kontinuierlichen Durchlauf im Schrittbetrieb bzw. für einen reinen Stationsbetrieb vorgestellt. Das Lötgut durchläuft eine Zuführstation zum Bestücken, eine Trocknungsstation in einer durch Schleusen verschlossenen Kammer, den eigentlichen Rezipienten, eine Kühlschleuse und ein Entstückungsmodul, wahlweise ist ein Reinigungsmodul direkt ankoppelbar. Die Erfindung beinhaltet eine Weiterentwicklung des Dampfphasenlötverfahrens, was sich im Aufbau des Rezipienten zeigt. Zur Lötung im Rezipienten dient eine teilweise mit einer inerten organischen Verbindung gefüllte Dampfphasenkammer. Dem Rezipienten wird das zu lötende Gut im getakteten Durchlaufbetrieb schrittweise zugeführt. Das zu lötende Gut wird in der Dampfphase durch die siedende inerte organische Verbindung auf Temperaturen oberhalb des Schmelzpunktes des Lotes erhitzt und nach Anheben des Lötgutes auf Zonen oberhalb der Dampfphase wird ein anschließendes Evakuieren bei Temperaturen noch oberhalb der Lotschmelze durchgeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23K 1/015

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 1/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 1/015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036626 A2 20000920; EP 1036626 A3 20020612; DE 19911887 C1 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 23K 1/015 A, 7H 05K 3/34 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI