Global Patent Index - EP 1036640 A1

EP 1036640 A1 2000-09-20 - Method for reclaiming slurry by a magnetic separator

Title (en)

Method for reclaiming slurry by a magnetic separator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Wiederaufarbeiten einer Suspension mit Hilfe eines Magnetabscheiders

Title (fr)

Procédé de recyclage de boue au moyen d'un séparateur magnétique

Publication

EP 1036640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105339 A

Priority

DE 19912252 A

Abstract (en)

Process for reprocessing a suspension produced during the mechanical processing of semiconductors and containing a liquid, an abrasive agent and a semiconductor abrasive comprises removing the abrasive agent, and then separating the liquid and semiconductor abrasive using a magnetic separator.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zum Wiederaufarbeiten einer Suspension, die beim mechanischen Bearbeiten von Halbleitermaterial anfällt und eine Flüssigkeit, ein abrasiv wirkendes Mittel und Abrieb aus Halbleitermaterial enthält, durch Abtrennen des abrasiv wirkenden Mittels und anschließendes Trennen der Flüssigkeit und des Abriebs. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Flüssigkeit und der Abrieb mit Hilfe eines Magnetabscheiders getrennt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/02; B03C 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 57/02 (2006.01); B03C 1/00 (2006.01); B24B 55/12 (2006.01); B28D 1/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 1/00 (2013.01); B28D 1/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5830369 A 19981103 - TOYAMA KOHEI [JP]
  • [A] US 4810368 A 19890307 - SEIDER ROBERT J [US], et al
  • [A] FR 2704455 A1 19941104 - STRATECH INTERNATIONAL [FR]
  • [A] T.J. DROZDA, C. WICK: "Tool and manufacturing engineers handbook, Vol 1, Machining", 1983, SOCIETY OF MANUFACTURING ENGINEERS (SME), DEARBORN (US), 1983, XP002140912, 012391
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 02 26 February 1999 (1999-02-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036640 A1 20000920; DE 19912252 A1 20000928; JP 2000308968 A 20001107; KR 20010014575 A 20010226; TW 466137 B 20011201; US 6264843 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI