Global Patent Index - EP 1036648 A2

EP 1036648 A2 2000-09-20 - Method for adjusting a rotary press for tablets with an angular pulse generator for determining the press load on the individual punches in at least one press station

Title (en)

Method for adjusting a rotary press for tablets with an angular pulse generator for determining the press load on the individual punches in at least one press station

Title (de)

Einstellverfahren für eine Rundläufertablettenpresse mit einem Winkelimpulsgeber zur Ermittlung des Presskraftverlaufs an den einzelnen Stempeln in mindestens einer Pressstation

Title (fr)

Procédé d'ajustement d 'une presse rotative pour comprimés avec un générateur d'impulsion angulaire pour déterminer la force de compression sur les poinçons individuels dans au moins une station de pressage

Publication

EP 1036648 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103295 A

Priority

DE 19911294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911294C1] The machine has a central matrix plate (10) with bores, and has upper (16) and lower (18) punches or dies which move toward each other. They are accommodated in upper (12) and lower (14) holding plates and are moved together by pressure rollers (22,24). The drive shaft (26) for the machine is connected to a motor transmission (20) and is fitted with a coding device (28) for producing a position coding signal as the shaft turns. Coarse and fine positioning steps are performed.

Abstract (de)

Einstellverfahren für eine Rundläufertablettenpresse mit einem Winkelimpulsgeber zur Ermittlung des Preßkraftverlaufs an den einzelnen Stempeln in mindestens einer Preßstation, bei der der Winkelimpulsgeber pro Umdrehung des Pressenrotors einen Umfangsimpuls und pro Drehwinkelwert einen Winkelimpuls erzeugt, gekennzeichnet durch folgende Schritte: Winkelimpulsgeber wird relativ zur Rotorwelle in beliebiger Position fest montiert, Der Rotor wird mit einem vorgegebenen Stempel visuell unter die Mitte einer Hauptdruckrolle bewegt (Grobposition), Der Rotor wird bis zum Auftauchen des Umfangsimpulses gedreht und die Winkelimpulse bis zum Umfangsimpuls werden von einem Maschinenrechner gezählt und ihre Anzahl wird gespeichert, Der Rechner errechnet die in Winkelimpulsen ausgedrückten Grobpositionen aller Stempel in bezug auf den Umfangsimpuls und erzeugt bei Drehung des Rotors einen Grob-Positionsimpuls pro Stempel, Im Rechner wird jeder Grobposition ein sich beidseitig der Grobposition erstreckendes Meßfenster zugeordnet, Im Betrieb der Tablettenpresse wird bei jedem Winkelimpuls im Meßfenster oder über den gesamten Signalverlauf pro Stempel der Preßkraftverlauf abgetastet, Der Rechner ermittelt die realen Stempelpositionen bei den Preßkraftmaxima oder -Minima und bestimmt die Abweichung (k) der realen Positionen von den Grobpositionen, Der Rechner ermittelt aus den einzelnen Abweichungen einen Korrekturfaktor zur Bestimmung der Feinpositionen der Stempel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/08; B30B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/00 (2006.01); B30B 11/08 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/0023 (2013.01); B30B 11/005 (2013.01); B30B 11/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911294 C1 20000615; EP 1036648 A2 20000920; EP 1036648 A3 20020424; EP 1036648 B1 20041229; US 6451228 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009068

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009068

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI