Global Patent Index - EP 1036659 A3

EP 1036659 A3 2001-04-25 - Device for controlling servo-components of a printing press by remote adjustment

Title (en)

Device for controlling servo-components of a printing press by remote adjustment

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Steuern fernverstellbarer Stellglieder einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour commander des organes de réglage d'une machine à imprimer par ajustage à distance

Publication

EP 1036659 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105165 A

Priority

DE 29905154 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1036659A2] Each adjusting element (1) has a position transmitter, working in conjunction with an absolute measuring system (2). On part of the control, address signals transmitted over a bus system (5) are storable in an address memory of the adjusting element. If the signal delivered by the position transmitter, corresponds to a position signal transmitted over the bus system. By the control (4), signals are transmittable over the bus system, which corresponds to a specified position range. The width of the position range is smaller than the width of an adjusting element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00; B41F 21/00; B65H 29/68; B65H 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/68 (2006.01); B65H 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 29/686 (2013.01); B65H 43/00 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905154 U1 19990617; AT 244145 T 20030715; EP 1036659 A2 20000920; EP 1036659 A3 20010425; EP 1036659 B1 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060311

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-07-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002699 P 20030807

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 33/00 A, 7B 41F 21/00 B, 7B 65H 29/68 B, 7B 65H 43/00 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI