Global Patent Index - EP 1036660 A1

EP 1036660 A1 2000-09-20 - Drop-on-Demand printhead with piezo bending transducers and driving method for the same

Title (en)

Drop-on-Demand printhead with piezo bending transducers and driving method for the same

Title (de)

Piezobiegewandler Drop-on-Demand Druckkopf sowie Verfahren zu dessen Ansteuerung

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à éjection de goutte à la demande utilisant des transducteurs piézo déformable en flexion, et sa méthode de commande

Publication

EP 1036660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105211 A

Priority

DE 19911399 A

Abstract (en)

Print head has an inkjet plate with a row of jets each controlled by a piezo-bend transducer. During printing of an image each transducer receives an activation pulse according to the image to be printed. The adjacent piezo-bend transducer receives a compensation pulse to prevent interaction between the two. Independent claims are made for a piezo-bend transducer controller where in addition to an activation pulse being sent to the printing transducer a blocking pulse is sent to the adjacent transducer of a suitable duration and a printer drop on demand print head using the procedures for controlling it described above.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Piezobiegewandler Drop-on-Demand Druckkopf sowie ein Verfahren zu dessen Ansteuerung. Nach dem Verfahren wird jeder der Piezobiegewandler eines Piezobiegewandler Drop-on-Demand Druckkopfes mit einer dem gewünschten Druckbild entsprechenden Sequenz von jeweils eine Tropfenausstoßbewegung bewirkenden Auslösepulsen beaufschlagt, und jedem Auslösepuls zugeordnet wird jeder dem von dem Auslösepuls ausgelösten Piezobiegewandler benachbarte Piezobiegewandler mit einem diesen auslenkenden Kompensationspuls beaufschlagt. Der Piezobiegewandler Drop-on-Demand Druckkopf weist eine Düsenplatte (1) mit in Reihe angeordneten Düsen (11), denen jeweils ein Piezobiegewandler (2) zugeordnet ist, der unter Ausstoßen eines Tropfens aus der jeweiligen Düse (11) mit einem Auslösepuls beaufschlagbar ist, und eine Steuervorrichtung (3) auf, von der nach dem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren jeder der Piezobiegewandler (2) mit Auslösepulsen und Kompensationspulsen beaufschlagbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); H01L 41/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/04525 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04596 (2013.01); B41J 2/14282 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14354 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036660 A1 20000920; EP 1036660 B1 20020828; CN 1182962 C 20050105; CN 1266783 A 20000920; DE 19911399 A1 20000928; DE 19911399 C2 20010301; JP 2000296619 A 20001024; US 6460979 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20110927

2011-10-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DASCOM EUROPE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20110927

2011-10-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DASCOM EUROPE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20110927

2010-12-22 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20101203

2010-12-22 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20101203

2010-12-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101118 AND 20101124

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB NL SE

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TALLY COMPUTERDRUCKER GMBH

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEINZL, JOACHIM, PROFESSOR DR.-ING.

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EDERER, INGO, DR.

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEITZ, HERMANN, DIPL.-ING.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI