Global Patent Index - EP 1036663 A1

EP 1036663 A1 2000-09-20 - Ink ribbon cartridge

Title (en)

Ink ribbon cartridge

Title (de)

Farbbandkassette

Title (fr)

Cartouche pour ruban encreur

Publication

EP 1036663 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810653 A

Priority

CH 48899 A

Abstract (en)

Cassette has a housing with two adjacent wall regions (1a,1b) in which there are grooves, recesses or slits (8) so that tape spools are arranged in the grooves at right angles to their own axes. An Independent claim is made for a franking machine using the spool assembly.

Abstract (de)

Die Kassette besteht im wesentlichen aus zwei Seitenwandungsbereichen (1a, 1b, 1c), wobei der eine Seitenwandungsbereich aus einer Doppelplatte besteht. In den Seitenwandungsbereichen sind Nuten und Schlitze zur Aufnahme der Aussenabschnitte von zwei Bandspulen (5,6) vorgesehen. Die Spulen können beim Bestücken der Kassette mit einem Thermotransferband senkrecht zur Spulenachse bis zu ihrer Endposition eingeschoben werden. Mittels eines über einen Betätigungsknopf (9) bewegbaren Rückhalteschiebers (9) werden die beiden Spulen an ihrer Endposition gehalten und gleichzeitig wird auf die eine Spule eine Bremskraft übertragen. Auf diese Weise wird verhindert, dass sich in der Kassette eine lose Bandschlaufe bilden kann. Ein über eine Handbetätigung ein- und ausschwenkbarer Bügel (11) ermöglicht das Einführen der bandbeschickten Kassette über einen Drehknopf (12), so dass beim Zurückschwenken des Bügels das Band am Druckkopf anliegt. Derartige Kassetten werden insbesondere in Frankiermaschinen eingesetzt und ermöglichen eine umweltschonende Nachladung des benötigten Thermodrucktransferbandes. Die Kassette zeichnet sich durch einen konstruktiv einfachsten und materialsparenden, aber robusten Aufbau aus und lässt dank ihrer offenen Bauweise ein Höchstmass an eingelegtem Bandmaterial zu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 35/28; B41J 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/32 (2006.01); B41J 32/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); B41J 17/32 (2013.01); B41J 32/00 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9900255 A1 19990107 - FRAMA AG [CH], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29913568 U1 19991007; DE 59915096 D1 20091203; EP 1036663 A1 20000920; EP 1036663 B1 20091021; US 6352380 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160720

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20120630

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100722

2009-12-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59915096 P 20091203

2009-11-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2009-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2009-10-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI