Global patent index - EP 1036667 A1

EP 1036667 A1 2000-09-20 - Printing plate and process for the production thereof

Title (en)

Printing plate and process for the production thereof

Title (de)

Druckplatte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Plaque d'impression et procédé pour la production d'une telle plaque

Publication

EP 1036667 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104850 A

Priority

DE 19911821 A

Abstract (en)

Over-wide printing plate cut from rolled strip material has a strip roll direction (WR) which is diagonal to the main direction of the printing plate (1). The plate is either aluminum or an aluminum alloy. An Independent claim is made for a process for production of a printing plate from a strip roll where a section is first cut and then a plate cut diagonally from it with dimensions less than that of the first cut section.

Abstract (de)

Druckplatte (1) aus gewalztem Blechband (4) für überbreite Maschinen mit gesteigerter Standzeit, wobei die Walzrichtung WR des Bleches schräg zu den Hauptrichtungen der Druckplatte (1) verläuft und ein Verfahren zur Erzeugung von rechteckigen Platinen (5) aus gewalztem Blechband (4) mit schräg zur Walzrichtung WR verlaufenden Hauptrichtungen, zur Herstellung solcher Druckplatten (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/08; B41N 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/08 (2006.01); B41N 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/083 (2013.01); B41N 3/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49798 (2013.01); Y10T 83/155 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036667 A1 20000920; EP 1036667 B1 20040428; DE 19911821 A1 20000928; DE 19911821 C2 20030320; US 6354205 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50006207

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI