Global Patent Index - EP 1036672 A1

EP 1036672 A1 2000-09-20 - Sharpener

Title (en)

Sharpener

Title (de)

Spitzereinheit

Title (fr)

Taille-crayon

Publication

EP 1036672 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104680 A

Priority

  • DE 19910841 A
  • DE 19955395 A

Abstract (en)

The profiled protrusions (12, 13) inside the casing for snap-fitting the base (4) and cover (5) parts of the casing together are specially positioned and shaped so as to be able to accomodate a small or large sharpener (2). For a small sharpener the profiles press in against the outer walls of the sharpener casing. For a large sharpener the profiles splay outwards against the inside of the sharpener casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Spitzereinheit besteht aus einem Stift- oder Minenspitzer (1 oder 2) und einem diesen umgebenden und fixierenden Hüllgehäuse (3), welches aus einem Bodenteil (4) und einer daran lösbar fixierten Haube (5) besteht. Außerdem ist eine Durchführungsöffnung (24) zum Zwecke der Durchführung eines Stiftes oder eine Mine von außen in den Stift- oder Minenspitzer (1,2) vorhanden. Die Hüllgehäuseteile (4,5) enthalten Fixiermittel (8,11) zur wahlweisen Fixierung von Spitzern (1,2) mit unterschiedlichen Außenabmessungen oder -formaten. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/00 (2006.01); B43L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2013.01); B43L 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2745600 A1 19790412 - KLEBES & CO KG A

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036672 A1 20000920; EP 1036672 B1 20030730; DE 19955395 A1 20000921; DE 19955395 C2 20010523; DE 29923800 U1 20010412; DE 50003056 D1 20030904; US 6334256 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2012-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HAFNER TERGAU WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSAN, DE

2012-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUM LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI