Global Patent Index - EP 1036706 A2

EP 1036706 A2 2000-09-20 - Lighting with fluorescent tubes for vehicle

Title (en)

Lighting with fluorescent tubes for vehicle

Title (de)

Fahrzeugleuchte mit Leuchtstoffröhre

Title (fr)

Eclairage à tubes fluorescents pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1036706 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104439 A

Priority

DE 19911647 A

Abstract (en)

The light has at least one rod-shaped light source (1), a light panel and a reflector (3). A covering device (6) covers both end sections of the rod-shaped light source so that it is not visible from the light panel. The light source is mounted on the reflector with the covering device. The covering device can be made in one piece with the reflector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte mit mindestens einer Lichtquelle (1), einer Lichtscheibe (2) und einem Reflektor (3), bei der die mindestens eine Lichtquelle (1) eine Leuchtstoffröhre ist, die jeweils mindestens einen elektrischen Anschlußdraht (5) an mindestens einem ihrer zwei Endabschnitte (4) aufweist. Um beim Aufbau der Leuchte flexiblere Lösungen von Design-Anforderungen zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß eine Befestigungsabdeckvorrichtung (6) in der Leuchte vorgesehen wird, die die beiden Endabschnitte (4) der Leuchtstoffröhre (1) mit dem Reflektor (3) verbindet, so daß die Leuchtstoffröhre (1) von dem Reflektor (3) gehalten wird, und die die beiden Endabschnitte (4) der Leuchtstoffröhre (1) abdeckt, so daß sie von der Lichtscheibe (2) nicht sichtbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60Q 3/04; F21V 17/04; F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/04 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/04 (2013.01); F21V 11/00 (2013.01); F21V 19/009 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19622779 A1 19971218 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036706 A2 20000920; EP 1036706 A3 20031210; DE 19911647 A1 20000921; DE 19911647 B4 20070405

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040611

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI