Global Patent Index - EP 1036720 A2

EP 1036720 A2 2000-09-20 - Transport installation for vehicles pulled by a rope

Title (en)

Transport installation for vehicles pulled by a rope

Title (de)

Transporteinrichtung für seilgezogene Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Installation de transport pour véhicules tractés par une corde

Publication

EP 1036720 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890080 A

Priority

AT 45899 A

Abstract (en)

The transporting device has a track carrier (3) for transporting the vehicle (5). There is at least one suspension cable (1) running along the track carrier. At least one sector of the track carrier is hung directly or via an intermediate element (4) from the suspension cable. There is at least one stabilizing cable (7, 7') at the side of or below the cross section of the track carrier.

Abstract (de)

Transporteinrichtung für seilgezogene Fahrzeuge, mit einem Fahrbahnträger (3) für den Transport der Fahrzeuge (5), umfassend einen oder mehrere Längsabschnitte, und zumindest einem Hängeseil (1), das in Längsrichtung des Fahrbahnträgers (3) verläuft, wobei zumindest ein Längsabschnitt des Fahrbahnträgers (3) direkt oder über Zwischenelemente (4) am Hängeseil (1) aufgehängt ist, mit zumindest einem Stabilisierungsseil (7, 7'), das im wesentlichen seitlich oder unterhalb des Querschnitts des Fahrbahnträgers (3) verläuft, wobei zumindest ein Längsabschnitt des Fahrbahnträgers (3) direkt oder über weitere Zwischenelemente (8, 8') mit dem bzw. den Stabilisierungsseil(en) (7, 7') verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036720 A2 20000920; EP 1036720 A3 20010801; EP 1036720 B1 20030820; AT 409252 B 20020725; AT A45899 A 20011115; CN 1266791 A 20000920; DE 50003326 D1 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160304

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20090702

2009-02-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040410

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-01-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBHPATENTANWALT

- Effective date: 20040410

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040410

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003326 P 20030925

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 61B 3/00 A, 7E 01D 11/02 B

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS B.V.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI