Global Patent Index - EP 1036721 A1

EP 1036721 A1 2000-09-20 - Transport device with at least one trolley or a similar vehicle riding along a cable

Title (en)

Transport device with at least one trolley or a similar vehicle riding along a cable

Title (de)

Transportvorrichtung mit mindestens einem auf einem Kabel verfahrbaren Laufwagen oder einem ähnlichen Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport comprenant au moins un chariot ou un véhicule analogue circulant sur un câble

Publication

EP 1036721 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440279 A

Priority

FR 9903488 A

Abstract (en)

the funicular passenger carrier has a carriage (2) with a roller to circulate on a cable (3). The roller is mounted in the carriage frame and has retaining hooks for the passengers. The receiving station has a brake for the carrier which automatically engages with a portion of the chassis

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de transport comprenant au moins un chariot ou un véhicule analogue circulant sur un câble ou un élément support allongé similaire s'étendant entre une station de départ et une station d'arrivée, la station de départ étant préférentiellement située à une altitude plus élevée que la station d'arrivée. Dispositif caractérisé en ce que ledit chariot (2) comprend au moins un moyen de roulement adapté pour circuler sur ledit câble ou élément support allongé similaire (3) et monté dans un châssis formant le corps du chariot (2) et pourvu de moyens d'accrochage du ou des objets et/ou sujets (8) à transporter et en ce que la station d'arrivée (5) comporte au moins une unité de freinage (9') du chariot (2) interagissant automatiquement et mécaniquement avec une partie au moins du châssis de ce dernier et/ou au moins une extension de celui-ci lors du passage dudit chariot (2) à sa hauteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 7/04; A63G 21/22; B61B 12/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63G 21/22 (2006.01); B61B 7/04 (2006.01); B61B 12/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63G 21/22 (2013.01); B61B 7/04 (2013.01); B61B 12/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036721 A1 20000920; FR 2791024 A1 20000922; FR 2791024 B1 20010601; ZA 200001187 B 20000920

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020830

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI