Global patent index - EP 1036733 A2

EP 1036733 A2 2000-09-20 - Automatic inflating arrangement for floatable life-saving device

Title (en)

Automatic inflating arrangement for floatable life-saving device

Title (de)

Selbsttätige Aufblasvorrichtung für schwimmfähige Rettungsgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de gonflage automatique pour appareil flottant de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1036733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105244 A

Priority

  • DE 29904651 U
  • DE 29914503 U

Abstract (en)

The inflation arrangement has an impact bolt (15) with a tip (16) for penetrating the sealing membrane (14) of a compressed gas cartridge (12), and a pyrotechnic charge (19) for driving a ram (22) to force the bolt towards the membrane against the force of a spring (23). The tip of the bolt rests on the membrane in the ready position, and the electrically conducting membrane is connected to a display via the bolt and the cartridge to indicate the presence or absence of a cartridge with an intact membrane.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer selbsttätigen unter Einwirken von Wasser auslösbarer Aufblasvorrichtung für schwimmfähige Rettungsgeräte, die einen Schlagbolzen 15 mit einer Spitze 16 zum Durchstoßen der Verschlußmembran 14 einer Druckgaspatrone 12 aufweist, treibt eine pyrotechnische Ladung 19 durch Zünden einen Stempel 22 zur Bewegung des Schlagbolzens 15 gegen die Kraft einer Feder 23 in Richtung auf die Verschlußmembran 14. Die Spitze 16 des Schlagbolzens 15 sowie die Verschlußmembran 14 bestehen aus elektrisch leitfähigen Werkstoffen. In der Bereitschaftsstellung liegt die Spitze 16 des Schlagbolzens 15 an der Verschlußmembran 14 an und stehen die Verschlußmembran 14 der Druckgaspatrone 12 einerseits sowie die Spitze 16 des Schlagbolzens 15 andererseits elektrisch mit einer Anzeigevorrichtung in Verbindung stehen, um das Fehlen oder Vorhandensein einer Druckgaspatrone 12 mit einer intakten Verschlußmembran 14 anzuzeigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/18 (2006.01); B63C 9/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/19 (2013.01); B63C 9/18 (2013.01); B63C 2009/0064 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4106435 A1 19910919 - HALKEY ROBERTS CORP [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6254447 B1 20010703; EP 1036733 A2 20000920; EP 1036733 A3 20001206; EP 1036733 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50002629

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB GR IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI