Global Patent Index - EP 1036733 B1

EP 1036733 B1 2003-06-25 - Automatic inflating arrangement for floatable life-saving device

Title (en)

Automatic inflating arrangement for floatable life-saving device

Title (de)

Selbsttätige Aufblasvorrichtung für schwimmfähige Rettungsgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de gonflage automatique pour appareil flottant de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1036733 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105244 A

Priority

  • DE 29904651 U
  • DE 29914503 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6254447B1] An inflation device is provided which is inflatable upon impact by water for marine flotation life preservers, wherein the tip of a striking pin is moved by means of a plunger which is driven by igniting a pyrotechnic charge in the direction of the sealing membrane of a pressure gas cartridge and against the force of a spring, and wherein the tip of the striking pin and the sealing membrane are of electrically conducting material, and wherein during a ready position of the device, the tip of the striking pin bears against the sealing membrane of the pressure gas cartridge and wherein the tip and the sealing membrane are in electrical connection with an indicator unit to form a closed electrical circuit, whereby the presence of an intact sealing membrane of the pressure gas cartridge, or the absence thereof, is detectable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/18 (2006.01); B63C 9/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/19 (2013.01); B63C 9/18 (2013.01); B63C 2009/0064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6254447 B1 20010703; EP 1036733 A2 20000920; EP 1036733 A3 20001206; EP 1036733 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002629 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB GR IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI