Global Patent Index - EP 1036739 A1

EP 1036739 A1 2000-09-20 - LIQUID CONTAINER MADE OF THIN LAMINATE OF SYNTHETIC RESIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

LIQUID CONTAINER MADE OF THIN LAMINATE OF SYNTHETIC RESIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER AUS DÜNNEM SCHICHTSTOFF AUS KUNSTHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR POUR LIQUIDES PRODUIT AVEC UN STRATIFIE MINCE EN RESINE SYNTHETIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1036739 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950481 A

Priority

  • JP 9804942 W
  • JP 31644397 A
  • JP 31641897 A

Abstract (en)

A thin-walled laminated synthetic resin body for a liquid container according to the invention comprises first and second thin-walled synthetic resin layers (10, 20), each having a curved surface portion (11, 21) and a projection (12, 22) extending outwardly from a predetermined region at an edge of the curved surface portion (11, 21). The first and second layers (10, 20) are laminated to each other with the curved surface portions (11, 21) bulging out in the same direction, are integrated with each other at the edges (13, 23) of the curved surface portions (11, 21) and projections (12, 22), and are separable from each other at regions exclusive of the edges (13, 23). When a liquid is charged, the curved surface portion (21) of one of the first and second layers (20) is separated from the curved surface portion (11) of the other layer (10) and reversed. By this, the curved surface portions bulge out in the opposite directions to define an inner space between the curved surface portions (11, 21) for containing a liquid. The laminated body has a high freedom degree of design of the container shape, can be readily formed into desired three-dimensional shape depending upon various applications, and can be manufactured simply and at low cost with conventional production system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 8/14; B29C 51/14; B65D 1/02; B65D 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 51/14 (2006.01); B32B 37/00 (2006.01); B32B 37/30 (2006.01); B65D 8/06 (2006.01); B65D 8/14 (2006.01); B65D 8/16 (2006.01); B65D 8/18 (2006.01); B65D 75/22 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B29C 43/24 (2006.01); B29C 51/10 (2006.01); B32B 37/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 37/0076 (2013.01); B29C 51/14 (2013.01); B65D 75/22 (2013.01); B65D 75/32 (2013.01); B65D 75/322 (2013.01); B65D 75/5822 (2013.01); B65D 75/5866 (2013.01); B29C 43/24 (2013.01); B29C 51/10 (2013.01); B29C 2791/001 (2013.01); B29C 2793/00 (2013.01); B29C 2795/00 (2013.01); B32B 37/153 (2013.01); B32B 38/0008 (2013.01); B32B 38/145 (2013.01); B32B 2310/14 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1334 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1352 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036739 A1 20000920; EP 1036739 A4 20030102; EP 1036739 B1 20041124; AU 719458 B2 20000511; AU 9651598 A 19990524; CA 2276440 A1 19990514; CA 2276440 C 20040518; CN 1088676 C 20020807; CN 1242750 A 20000126; DE 69827842 D1 20041230; DE 69827842 T2 20051208; JP 3993249 B2 20071017; KR 100346035 B1 20020724; KR 20000069759 A 20001125; TW 446630 B 20010721; US 2002132069 A1 20020919; US 6586060 B2 20030701; WO 9922996 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141030

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141030

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69827842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-10-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051030

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69827842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-11-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-03-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LIQUID CONTAINER MADE OF THIN LAMINATE OF SYNTHETIC RESIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LIQUID CONTAINER MADE OF THIN LAMINATE OF SYNTHETIC RESIN AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-01-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021108

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990719

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL