Global patent index - EP 1036752 A2

EP 1036752 A2 2000-09-20 - Method and device for separating flat articles

Title (en)

Method and device for separating flat articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln flächiger Güter

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour séparer des articles plats

Publication

EP 1036752 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105240 A

Priority

DE 19911273 A

Abstract (en)

The process for separating flat items from a pile comprises lifting the top item from the pile and moving it at an angle of 30 -150 degrees to the height axis of the pile. While the first item is being moved, the next is lifted into the gap formed behind its back edge. AN Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the process.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Vereinzeln von flächigen, gestapelten Gütern, die vorzugsweise einem Weiterverarbeitungsprozeß einzeln mit Abstand zueinander und hintereinanderliegend zugeleitet werden, wobei zunächst ein mindestens teilweises, vorzugsweise vollständiges, Abheben des obersten Guts vom Güterstapel und anschließend in Transportrichtung ein Abtransport zum Weiterverarbeitungsprozeß erfolgt, wobei die Transportrichtung mit der Hochachse des Güterstapels einen Winkel (), vorzugsweise im Bereich von 30° bis 150°, einschließt, vorgeschlagen, bei dem der Abtransport der Güter derart erfolgt, daß während des Abtransports eines den Stapel mit seinem Hinterkantenbereich noch teilweise überlappendes Gut bereits ein nachfolgendes Gut in dessen Hinterkantenbereich zum Abtransport vom Güterstapel abgehoben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/08; B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/224 (2013.01); B65H 3/0825 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3124 (2013.01); B65H 2406/323 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2406/3124 + B65H 2220/09

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036752 A2 20000920; EP 1036752 A3 20011031; EP 1036752 B1 20050720; DE 19911273 A1 20000921; DE 19911273 C2 20030731; ES 2245625 T3 20060116; US 6402134 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150314

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150313

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150313

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150313

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140307

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50010726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120315 AND 20120321

2011-08-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50010726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GLEISS GROSSE SCHRELL & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-08-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50010726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2245625

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MICHEL, BJOERN

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI