Global Patent Index - EP 1036753 A2

EP 1036753 A2 2000-09-20 - Lifting magnet

Title (en)

Lifting magnet

Title (de)

Lasthebemagnet

Title (fr)

Aimant de levage

Publication

EP 1036753 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103288 A

Priority

DE 19911897 A

Abstract (en)

Both ends of the lifting magnets (10) have a guide (16,17) at right angles to them and along which moves a swivel arm (22,23) each with a safety grip. The other end of the swivel arm has safety grips (24,25) which can turn and be adjusted in height. The guide consists of a spindle along which a spindle nut is adjustable in height. A permanent magnet or electro magnet has a magnet coil in a housing. The top end of the guide is connected to a suspension (14,15).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Lasthebemagneten, welcher an einer Aufhängung höhenveränderlich aufgehängt ist und zur Aufnahme von magnetisierbarem (ferromagnetischem) Material an einer Stelle sowie zu dessen Transport von der einen zu einer anderen Stelle und dessen Abwurf an der anderen Stelle dient, ist vorgesehen, daß an beiden Enden des Lasthebemagneten (10) je eine senkrecht zum Lasthebemagneten (10) orientierte Führung (16,17) vorgesehen ist, entlang welcher je ein Schwenkarm (22, 23) mit je einem an dessen anderem Ende angebrachten Sicherheitsgreifer (24,25) höhenverstellbar und drehbar angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036753 A2 20000920; EP 1036753 A3 20031015; DE 19911897 A1 20000921; DE 19911897 B4 20080221

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-08-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WOLFGANG, KONRAD

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI