Global Patent Index - EP 1036837 A1

EP 1036837 A1 2000-09-20 - UNIT FOR SUPPLYING A COKE-DEPOSIT INHIBITOR SOLUTION IN TUBE FURNACES USED FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF RAW HYDROCARBONS

Title (en)

UNIT FOR SUPPLYING A COKE-DEPOSIT INHIBITOR SOLUTION IN TUBE FURNACES USED FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF RAW HYDROCARBONS

Title (de)

EINHEIT ZUR ABGABE VON LÖSUNGEN VON KOKSABLAGERUNGEN IN ROHRÖFEN, VERWENDUNG BEI PYROLYSE VON ROH-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

UNITE PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE UNE SOLUTION D'INHIBITEUR DE DEPOTS DE COKE DANS DES FOURS A TUBE SERVANT A LA PYROLYSE D'HYDROCARBURES BRUTS

Publication

EP 1036837 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929942 A

Priority

  • RU 9800146 W
  • RU 97117379 A

Abstract (en)

A unit for injecting a coke-deposition inhibitor solution into tubular furnaces for hydrocarbon pyrolysis including a straight run (1) of a coil with pipe (4) for supplying a feedstock, an inhibitor atomizer, a tube (6) for supplying an inhibitor to atomizer and surrounding it an additional tube (7) are positioned coaxially. Elimination of coil burns-outs in the zone of inhibitor solution injection is reached that that injection unit is provided with a vortex gate concentrically located within a straight run (1) of a coil in the zone of inhibitor solution injection. Preferred vortex gate consists of radial plates (9), which attached symmetrically to the additional tube (7), and of cylindrical rings (10, 11, 12, 13), which attached to the radial plates (9) coaxially with the additional tube (7) and formed inner passage, which expand stepwise on the direction of flow of feedstock. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036837 A1 20000920; EP 1036837 A4 20021016; EP 1036837 B1 20040225; AT 260329 T 20040315; AU 745155 B2 20020314; AU 7944198 A 19990427; BG 104301 A 20001229; BG 63947 B1 20030731; BR 9812885 A 20000808; CA 2306852 A1 19990415; CN 1163571 C 20040825; CN 1274384 A 20001122; CZ 20001204 A3 20010117; CZ 291301 B6 20030115; DE 69821975 D1 20040401; DE 69821975 T2 20041216; ES 2216291 T3 20041016; HU 0003868 A2 20010228; HU 0003868 A3 20010528; HU 222844 B1 20031229; JP 2001519456 A 20011023; KR 100438847 B1 20040705; NO 20001832 A 20000608; NO 20001832 D0 20000407; PL 339810 A1 20010102; PT 1036837 E 20040730; RU 2119524 C1 19980927; TR 200000943 T2 20021021; WO 9918172 A1 19990415; WO 9918172 A8 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FOREST STAR INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050519

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050518

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FOREST STAR INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216291 T3

2004-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-04-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821975 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUSCHUEV, VLADIMIR ANDREEVICH

2004-02-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEMTSOV, JURY SERGEEVICH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-10-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10G 9/16 A, 7B 01J 19/00 B

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE