Global Patent Index - EP 1036839 A2

EP 1036839 A2 2000-09-20 - Tablets and particulate detergents comprising cross-linked polyvinylpyrrolidone and its use

Title (en)

Tablets and particulate detergents comprising cross-linked polyvinylpyrrolidone and its use

Title (de)

Kompakte, teilchenförmige Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel enthaltend quervernetztes Polyvinylpyrrolidon und dessen Verwendung

Title (fr)

Tablettes et particules détergentes contenant de la polyvinylpyrrolidone réticulée et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1036839 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103131 A

Priority

DE 19912031 A

Abstract (en)

Use is claimed of crosslinked polyvinyl pyrrolidone (PVP) particles, of size 50-400 mu , as additives for compacted particulate detergents to increase the disintegration rate when the detergent comes in contact with water. Independent claims are also included for: (i) compacted particulate detergent compositions containing 0.5-20 wt.% of the PVP additive particles of size 50-400 mu with at least 10 wt.% below 200 mu ; and (ii) production of such compositions containing the PVP disintegrating agent by mixing the PVP particles with powdered detergent ingredients and compacting the mixture.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Verwendung von quervernetztem Polyvinylpyrrolidon als Zusatz zu kompakten, teilchenförmigen Wasch- und Reinigungsmitteln zur Erhöhung ihrer Zerfallsgeschwindigkeit beim Zusammenbringen mit Wasser, wobei die Partikel des quervernetzten Polyvinylpyrrolidons eine Korngröße von 50 bis 400 µm aufweisen, ein Verfahren zur Herstellung der kompakten, teilchenförmigen Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel sowie die kompakten, teilchenförmige Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel selbst.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 17/00; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036839 A2 20000920; EP 1036839 A3 20010418; CN 1165605 C 20040908; CN 1267715 A 20000927; DE 19912031 A1 20000921; JP 2000273490 A 20001003; US 6329334 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040309

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010913;SI PAYMENT 20010913

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI