Global Patent Index - EP 1036866 A2

EP 1036866 A2 2000-09-20 - Sewing thread and method for the production of a sewing thread

Title (en)

Sewing thread and method for the production of a sewing thread

Title (de)

Nähgarn sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Nähgarnes

Title (fr)

Fil à coudre et procédé pour la production d'un tel fil à coudre

Publication

EP 1036866 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103561 A

Priority

DE 19911757 A

Abstract (en)

A sewing yarn has a core-sheath structure, whereby the yarn spun around the multi-filament core contains fewer than an average of 41 individual fibers. Sewing yarn (I) is prepared from two component yarns (II) by twisting them together, whereby each component yarn has a core thread construction, comprising (A) a multifilament yarn core and (B) a second yarn that is spun around the core, whereby at least one of the component yarns contains fewer than 41 individual fibers. An Independent claim is included for a process for the production of (I) whereby the roving of each component yarn is compressed immediately prior to spinning with the multi-filament core, such that at least one component yarn in the finished yarn (I) contains fewer than 41, preferably 20-38 individual fibers.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Nähgarn aus mindestens zwei Vorgarnen, die unter Ausbildung des Nähgarnes miteinander verzwirnt sind, beschrieben, wobei jedes Vorgarn die Konstruktion eines Coregarnes aufweist, das eine mindestens eine Seele ausbildende erste multifile Garnkomponente und eine die Seele umspinnende zweite Fasergarnkomponente umfaßt. Im Querschnitt des Nähgarnes gesehen weist die Fasergarnumspinnung des mindestens einen Vorgarnes weniger als 41 Einzelfasern auf. Bei dem Verfahren zur Herstellung des Nähgarnes werden mindestens zwei Vorgarne zunächst erstellt, wobei zur Erstellung eines jeden Vorgarnes eine aus Fasergarnen erstellte Lunte zusammen mit der als Seele dienenden multifilen Garnkomponente einer Spinneinrichtung zugeführt und dort versponnen wird und hiernach die mindestens beiden Vorgarne miteinander verzwirnt werden. Die Lunte des Fasergarnes wird unmittelbar vor dem Zuführen zur Spinneinrichtung so weit verdichtet, so daß im fertigen Nähgarn die Fasergarnumspinnung von mindestens einem Vorgarn über den Querschnitt des Nähgarnes gesehen weniger als 41 Einzelfasern, vorzugsweise zwischen 20 Einzelfasern und 38 Einzelfasern, aufweist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/46; D02G 3/28; D02G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/38 (2006.01); D02G 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/46 (2013.01); D02G 3/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036866 A2 20000920; EP 1036866 A3 20031105; EP 1036866 B1 20101222; AT 492668 T 20110115; DE 19911757 A1 20000921; DE 50016045 D1 20110203; ES 2357484 T3 20110426; PT 1036866 E 20110104; US 2002139103 A1 20021003; US 6425237 B1 20020730; US 6546711 B2 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110219

2012-01-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016045

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-07-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-04-26 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2357484 T3

- Effective date: 20110426

2011-04-13 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-02-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016045

- Effective date: 20110203

2011-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50016045 P 20110203

2011-01-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-01-04 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20101228

2010-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071005

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 02G 3/46 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 02G 3/28 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 02G 3/36 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI