Global Patent Index - EP 1036867 A1

EP 1036867 A1 2000-09-20 - Apparatus for assisting the return of threads into respective presentation channels within warpers which carry out thread-by-thread warping

Title (en)

Apparatus for assisting the return of threads into respective presentation channels within warpers which carry out thread-by-thread warping

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Unterstützung des Wiedereintritts der Fäden in deren jeweilige Vorlegekanäle Einzelfaden-Schärmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour assister le retour des fils dans leurs canneaux de présentation respectifs dans les ourdissoirs de type fil par fil

Publication

EP 1036867 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830646 A

Priority

IT FI990034 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for assisting the return of threads into respective dwell and presentation channels within warpers carrying out thread-by-thread warping and provided with a thread-holding hook (2) intended for picking up and winding individual threads onto a support offered by the warper according to a sequence corresponding to the selected warping program, comprising a plurality of flat elements (1) cascade-like disposed unidirectionally in the direction (D) of transit of the threads each time engaged by the thread-holder (2) within an area (H) between the warper and a reel for the support of the threads, each of said elements (1) exhibiting a portion (11) which engages the corresponding thread being in a dwell and presentation attitude and movable between a position in which said portion (11) engages the corresponding thread and a position in which the thread is disengageable from said portion (11) by means of the thread-holding hook (2) which transits within said area (H). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036867 A1 20000920; EP 1036867 B1 20030709; DE 69909429 D1 20030814; DE 69909429 T2 20040722; IT 1310010 B1 20020205; IT FI990034 A1 19990524

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909429 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE IT PT

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT PT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT PT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI