Global Patent Index - EP 1036873 A2

EP 1036873 A2 2000-09-20 - Method for spinning wet laundry

Title (en)

Method for spinning wet laundry

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schleudern von nasser Wäsche

Title (fr)

Procédé pour essorer du linge mouillé

Publication

EP 1036873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104165 A

Priority

DE 19908802 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19908802A1] The revolution speed acceleration during the spinning run-up (phases B-F) can be altered in accordance with the level of liquid (h). The acceleration is altered to match the actual level of liquid (h) in the washing solution container. It is reduced when the measured liquid level (h) rises or exceeds an upper limit.

Abstract (de)

Zum Schleudern von nasser Wäsche in einer in einem Laugenbehälter einer Wäschebehandlungsmaschine drehbaren Trommel wird deren Drehzahl in einem Schleuderhochlauf bis zu einer Schleuderenddrehzahl erhöht. Die dabei ausgeschleuderte Flüssigkeit wird dabei mit einer begrenzten Förderleistung aus dem Laugenbehälter abgepumpt oder allgemein entfernt. Um sowohl einen zu großen als auch einen zu kleinen Flüssigkeitsstand im Laugenbehälter zu vermeiden, wird die Drehzahlbeschleunigung beim Schleuderhochlauf in Abhängigkeit von der gemessenen Größe des aktuellen Flüssigkeitsstands verändert beziehungsweise geregelt. Damit kann eine Flüssigkeitsringbildung und ein Ansaugen von Luft durch die Laugenpumpe verhindert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/007 (2013.01); D06F 2202/085 (2013.01); D06F 2204/065 (2013.01); Y02B 40/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19908802 A1 20000907; EP 1036873 A2 20000920; EP 1036873 A3 20001004; EP 1036873 B1 20040225

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005370 P 20040401

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLDUAN, EDWIN

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULZE, INGO

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIEMER, HORST

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CZYZEWSKI, GUNDULA

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI