Global Patent Index - EP 1036877 A1

EP 1036877 A1 2000-09-20 - Rotor with wear protector for a pulper

Title (en)

Rotor with wear protector for a pulper

Title (de)

Rotor mit einem Verschleiss-Schutz für einen Stoffauflöser

Title (fr)

Rotor avec protecteur anti-usure pour un pulpeur

Publication

EP 1036877 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104475 A

Priority

EP 99104475 A

Abstract (en)

The rotor (10), at an assembly for the preparation of paper pulp, has a number of rotor blades (14) to agitate and recirculate a paper fiber suspension in a vessel. The leading surface (20) of each blade (14), in the direction of rotation (18), carries a wear protection shrouding (42) on a release mounting. At least the leading section of the front surface (20) is wholly covered by the protective shrouding (42) at the free end (30) of the rotor blade (14). The side edges of the protective shrouding extend at least partially over the front surface (20) of the rotor blade (14), and the free end (30) of the rotor blade is covered by the shrouding (42) which extends over it. The projecting end of the shrouding (42), over the free end of the rotor blade (14), is angled downwards towards the under side of the rotor blade (14) facing the base of the vessel. The shrouding (42) is secured to the rotor blade (14) by at least one screw bolt (50,52,54) through passage openings (24,26,28) from the rear side (22) of the blade (14), secured by a self-locking nut (56,58,60), so that the shrouding (42) can be fitted and removed. At least one centering pin can be at the rear side of the shrouding (42) or the front side of the blade (14) to fit into a corresponding hole. The edge of the protective shrouding (42) has a projecting rim to fit round the rotor blade (14) which supports it from below, The contour of the front side of the shrouding (42) is at least partially chamfered. At least one side edge of the protective shrouding (42) can have a number of recesses to give movement to the fiber suspension being stirred by the rotor (10). The rear side of the shrouding can rest on a support between it and the rotor blade. The leading side of the protective shrouding (42) is mounted at an angle to the base of the vessel for the fiber suspension.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rotor (10) für eine Papierstoffaufbereitungsmaschine. Der Rotor weist mehrere Rotorblätter (14) zum Umwälzen einer in einem Behälter der Papierstoffaufbereitungsmaschine enthaltenen Stoffsuspension auf. An der in Rotationsrichtung (18) des Rotors (10) gesehen führenden Vorderfläche (20) jedes Rotorblattes (14) ist ein Verschleißschutz (42) lösbar befestigt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/347 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036877 A1 20000920; EP 1036877 B1 20020619; DE 59901791 D1 20020725

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901791

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130305

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901791

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-25

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-09-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990920

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE NL

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI