Global patent index - EP 1036880 A1

EP 1036880 A1 2000-09-20 - Process and apparatus for making tissue paper and tissue paper made thereby

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for making tissue paper and tissue paper made thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Tissue-Papier sowie das damit erhältliche Tissue-Papier

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de papier tissé et papier tissé ainsi fabriqué

Publication

EP 1036880 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104552 A

Priority

DE 19912226 A

Abstract (en)

To produce a tissue paper, the pulp is formed into a web by water extraction, after the stock inlet, and the wet web passes through mechanical presses for further water extraction, and the web is dried. At the press section, at least one roller gap is formed by a pliable material and a structuring medium to give the paper web an embossed structure. The structuring medium is a structured roller, or a structured belt or fourdrinier with a mesh allowing a flow through it. The pliable material is absorbent or non-absorbent to water, as a press blanket or a synthetic porous material. The structured belt or fourdrinier presses the web against a drying cylinder. Before the web reaches the press section, it has a dry content of 5-20 wt% of dry matter and, after the press section, 20-50 wt% of dry matter. An Independent claim is included for a papermaking machine, for tissue paper, with a pliable material and especially a press blanket (4) at the roller press gap and a structuring medium (6), The press section (5) is followed by a drying cylinder (8). Preferred Features: The press section (5) has at least one roller press gap (12,13) to take through it a structured belt or fourdrinier (6) and a pliable press blanket (4), with the web between them. The roller press gaps (12,13) are in succession along the web path, where one and preferably the downstream gap is a long press gap (13). Downstream of the press section (5), the structured belt (6) is pressed against the drying cylinder (8) by a pressure roller (7). At least one press roller (10,11), at the press section (5), is a suction roller. The press section (5) is composed of three press rollers (9-11), where a center roller (9) is flanked by press rollers (10,11) to form the roller press gaps (12,13). The upstream press roller (10) for the first press gap (12) is a suction roller. A guide roller for the blanket (4) can be between the roller press gaps (12,13), without forming a press gap. The structured belt (6) has a woven base with a thin cladding layer, to form the embossing structure on the paper side of the woven belt. The structure is formed by a laser gravure process, to give raised and depressed zones. The raised zones are continuous or interrupted, at the same or different height levels. The structured belt (6) is impermeable to water, or it can be perforated over its surface and especially in the depressed zones. A further Independent claim is included for a tissue paper of surface sections in at least two different orientations at different levels on parallel planes.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung von wasseraufnahmefähigerem Tissue-Papier erfolgt in der Pressenpartie 5 einer Tissue-Papiermaschine eine Verformung bzw. Strukturgebung der Papierbahn über eine Strukturband 6, welches mit dem Filz die Pressenpartie durchläuft, und zwar unter Einschließung der Papierbahn. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036880 A1 20000920; DE 19912226 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031129

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI