Global Patent Index - EP 1036883 A2

EP 1036883 A2 2000-09-20 - Process for heating a screed of a road paver and corresponding road paver

Title (en)

Process for heating a screed of a road paver and corresponding road paver

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beheizen der Einbaubohle eines Strassenfertigers, sowie entsprechender Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Procédé pour chauffer une poutre lisseuse d'un finisseur et finisseur correspondant

Publication

EP 1036883 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105550 A

Priority

DE 19912248 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a heater (H) built into the application board (B) with several electrical heating elements (E) driven by a three-phase generator (G). At least one of the heating elements is switched on and off during the application phase An Independent claim is also included for an electrical heater.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Verfahren zum Beheizen der Einbaubohle (B) eines Straßenfertigers, wobei in der Einbaubohle (B) eine Heizeinrichtung (H) mit mehreren von einem Drehstromgenerator (G) versorgten und über eine Steuervorrichtung (C) ein- und abschaltbaren Heizelementen (E) vorgesehen ist, werden zumindest zwei der Heizelemente (E) in Abhängigkeit von der Betriebstemperatur des Generators und/oder mit Einbaumaterial in Kontakt stehender Einbaubohlen-Komponenten mit einer Taktung periodisch wechselweise ein- und abgeschaltet. Die Heizeinrichtung (H) enthält in der Steuervorrichtung (C) eine Mikroprozessor-Management-Sektion (M) mit einer Programmierung zum wechselweisen Takten von Heizelementen unter Berücksichtigung einer bestimmten Kombination von Betriebsparametern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 2301/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036883 A2 20000920; EP 1036883 A3 20020710; EP 1036883 B1 20040714; DE 19912248 A1 20000921; US 6421594 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50007035

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50007035

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50007035

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50007035

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-03-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007035

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR HEATING A SCREED OF A ROAD PAVER AND CORRESPONDING ROAD PAVER

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 01C 19/48 A, 7H 05B 1/02 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI