Global Patent Index - EP 1036884 A2

EP 1036884 A2 2000-09-20 - Deflecting device for avalanches with inclined surface areas

Title (en)

Deflecting device for avalanches with inclined surface areas

Title (de)

Ableiten von Lawinen mit geneigten Flächenbereichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour dévier des avalanches comprenant des secteurs de surface inclinés

Publication

EP 1036884 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105418 A

Priority

DE 19912237 A

Abstract (en)

The structure is for protecting an object (1) and diverting material rolling into a valley, e.g. snow, scree or rockfalls, away from it. It comprises two nets (F1, F2) of steel cable which are anchored to a point (A) above the object and fill the length and breadth of the valley in a tent shape

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung möchte eine Schutzverbauung für Lawinen und sonstige Volumenbewegungen schaffen, die kostengünstiger hergestellt werden kann und mit einem Minimum an zu betonierenden Fundamenten auskommt. Vorgeschlagen wird dazu eine Schutzverbauung zum Schutz eines Objekts (1) und durch Ableiten der sich zu Tal wälzenden Volumenmassen oder Steinschlag. Oberhalb des Schutzobjektes (1) ist ein erster Ankerpunkt (A) vorgesehen, von dem ausgehend zumindest einer, vorzugsweise zwei sich erhebende Flächenbereiche (F1,F2) sich unter Verlängerung und Verbreiterung zu Tal gerichtet erstrecken. Zumindest einer der seitlichen Flächenbereiche (F1,F2) ist elastisch nachgiebig ausgebildet. Nicht unberücksichtigt läßt die Erfindung auch den Aspekt des Umweltschutzes, so daß die geschaffene Schutzverbauung ein ansprechendes Äußeres bietet und sich hinsichtlich ihres Aussehens harmonisch in die Landschaft einfügt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036884 A2 20000920; EP 1036884 A3 20030625; DE 19912237 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031228

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HIERL, ELISABETH

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI