Global Patent Index - EP 1036899 A2

EP 1036899 A2 2000-09-20 - A cremone bolt handle for doors and windows

Title (en)

A cremone bolt handle for doors and windows

Title (de)

Betätigungsgriff für Treibstangenschlösser einer Tür oder eines Fensters

Title (fr)

Poignée pour crémone de porte ou de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1036899 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830569 A

Priority

IT BO990128 A

Abstract (en)

A cremone bolt handle envisages control parts (7) consisting of an actuator bar (13) projecting from an opening (12) in a base element (11) and attached to a corresponding rack defining an element (10) for supporting, connecting and driving the bar. The bar (13) has a pawl (14), attached at one end and rocking, thanks to means (15), in a direction perpendicular with the plane of the bar (13) in such a way as to assume a locking position following a connection inside a seat (16) in the base element (11) and when the door or window is in an open configuration, that is to say, with a first part (3) of the door or window distanced from the second part (8) and, respectively, a bar (13) release position, when the door or window is in a closed configuration, that is to say, with the first part (3) moved towards the second part (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 13/10; E05B 63/18; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05B 63/18 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05B 13/106 (2013.01); E05B 63/185 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036899 A2 20000920; EP 1036899 A3 20021106; IT 1310347 B1 20020213; IT BO990128 A1 20000918; IT BO990128 D0 19990317

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070331

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050613

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 1/00 A, 7E 05C 9/00 B, 7E 05B 63/18 B, 7E 05B 13/10 B, 7E 05D 15/526 B

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GSG INTERNATIONAL S.P.A.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI