Global Patent Index - EP 1036902 A1

EP 1036902 A1 2000-09-20 - Locking device for a flap, door, or the like

Title (en)

Locking device for a flap, door, or the like

Title (de)

Verschluss für eine Klappe, Türe oder dgl.

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage pour volet, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1036902 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102310 A

Priority

DE 19911792 A

Abstract (en)

The operating element (36) on the flap, door or such like controls a locking mechanism (23) formed on the body, frame (20) and such like in the form of a locking bolt. The operating element is adjustable in relation to the body or frame (10).at right angles to that of the flap and door. The operating element controls, on the inside of the flap or door, a locking mechanism consisting of a lever (32) and pivot mounted locking claw (42). the operating element is in the form of a U-shaped handle whose sides fit into passages (11) in the flap or door.

Abstract (de)

Die Bedienung des Verschlusses wird dadurch wesentlich vereinfacht und eine sichere Verriegelung der Schließstellung dadurch erreicht, daß das Verriegelungselement (23) an dem Korpus, Rahmen und dergleichen (20) als Verriegelungsbolzen ausgebildet ist, insbesondere für Möbel, daß das Betätigungselement (36) zur Klappe, Tür oder dergleichen (10) verstellbar ist und auf der Innenseite derselben einen Verriegelungsmechanismus aus Verriegelungshebel (32) und drehbar gelagerter Verriegelungsklaue (42) steuert, wobei in der Öffnungsstellung des Verschlusses die Verriegelungsklaue (42) in einer Aufnahmestellung zum Einführen des Verriegelungsbolzens (23) gehalten ist und wobei in der Schließstellung die Verriegelungsklaue den Verriegelungsbolzen hintergreift und der von dem Betätigungselement (36) verstellbare, abgefederte Verriegelungshebel (32) die Verriegelungsklaue (42) in der Schließstellung verriegelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/16 (2006.01); E05C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/24 (2013.01); E05C 3/162 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1053 (2015.04); Y10T 292/106 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036902 A1 20000920; EP 1036902 B1 20020313; DE 19911792 A1 20000928; DE 19911792 C2 20020620; US 6419287 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI