Global patent index - EP 1036903 A1

EP 1036903 A1 2000-09-20 - Closure for a wing, door or the like

Title (en)

Closure for a wing, door or the like

Title (de)

Verschluss für eine Klappe, Türe oder dgl.

Title (fr)

Fermeture pour battant, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1036903 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102311 A

Priority

DE 19911793 A

Abstract (en)

The operating mechanism (36) for the closure piece controls a locking mechanism and is in the form of a U shaped handle with two parallel arms which are adjustably fixed to the flap or door (10). At least one of the arms goes through a passage (11) in the flap or door and is joined to a locking lever (32) and or a guide lever on a fitting (30). The pivot axle (31) on which the levers pivot is parallel with the hinge axis of the flap or door. The free end of one of the operating element's arms is connected to a connecting sleeve (34) through which extends a fixture screw (35).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Verschluß für eine an einem Korpus, Rahmen oder dergleichen (20) angelenkte Klappe, Tür (10) oder dergleichen, bei dem am Korpus, Rahmen oder dergleichen ein Verriegelungselement (23,24) fest angebracht ist, und die Klappe, Tür oder dergleichen ein Betätigungselement (36) trägt, wobei das Betätigungselement einen Verriegelungsmechanismus (32,42) steuert, der beim Öffnen außer Eingriff und beim Schließen in Eingriff mit dem Verriegelungselement bringbar ist. Das Betätigungselement ist aus der Schließstellung in die Offenstellung mittels einer Zugkraft verstellbar, die im Wesentlichen senkrecht zu der von der Klappe, Tür oder dergleichen gebildeten Anschlußebene wirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/16 (2006.01); E05C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/162 (2013.01); E05C 3/24 (2013.01); Y10T 292/0859 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0862 (2015.04); Y10T 292/106 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036903 A1 20000920; EP 1036903 B1 20060118; DE 19911793 A1 20000928; DE 19911793 B4 20060406; US 6752437 B1 20040622

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080203

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2006-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI