Global Patent Index - EP 1036904 A2

EP 1036904 A2 2000-09-20 - Security device

Title (en)

Security device

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité

Publication

EP 1036904 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302223 A

Priority

GB 9906123 A

Abstract (en)

A security device for preventing unauthorised entry through an inwardly opening door of a building is described, the device comprising an elongate strut member having means to adjust the length thereof; the strut also having at one end means to engage with a location bracket fixed to a floor area in front of the opening direction of a door, and having at the remote end engaging means to engage with the door or a doorjamb adjacent the opening edge of the door; the strut being positionable, in use between two positions: a first position where the strut is rigidly braced against the door when the building is occupied; and, a second position where the strut is rigidly braced against the doorjamb.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/004 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036904 A2 20000920; EP 1036904 A3 20020410; GB 2347967 A 20000920; GB 9906123 D0 19990512

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI