Global Patent Index - EP 1036908 A2

EP 1036908 A2 2000-09-20 - Door leaf

Title (en)

Door leaf

Title (de)

Türflügel

Title (fr)

Vantail de porte

Publication

EP 1036908 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105268 A

Priority

DE 29904972 U

Abstract (en)

The door panel has inner and outer sheets (5,6) containing an inner core (7), with an opening to take a window pane and the like. The outer sheets (5,6) project beyond the outer edge of the core (7) by given dimensions, at set edge zones of the door filling (4). Each of the decorative edge profiles (14-17), for the window opening, form plug bars to clip on to the free edges of the outer door sheets (5,6) with grooves of the same width as the door sheets. A reinforcement body (22), as a quadrilateral profile, is in a positive fit between the door panel sheets (5,6) at the window opening, in front of the free upper surface of the core (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Türflügel, mit einem Türblatt aus einem aus Profilen zusammengesetzten Flügelrahmen, der eine aus einem beidseitig mit Blech kaschierten Kern bestehende plattenartige Türfüllung einfaßt, die wenigstens eine ausgeschnittene Öffnung aufweist, in die ein die Öffnung verschließendes Plattenelement, z.B. eine Verglasung, eingesetzt und mittels den Rand der Öffnung einfassender Zierprofile gehalten ist. Die Bleche stehen in vorbestimmten Randbereichen der Türfüllung über den Außenrand des Kerns um ein bestimmtes Maß vor. Jedes Zierprofil ist als auf die freie Kante eines jeweils zugeordneten Blechs steckbare Steckleiste ausgebildet. Jedes Zierprofil hat eine Steckaufnahme, die als Längsnut ausgebildet ist, deren Nutbreite wenigstens gleich der Dicke des in der Steckaufnahme aufgenommenen Bleches ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/72; E06B 3/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/72 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/72 (2013.01); E06B 3/5892 (2013.01); E06B 3/721 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904972 U1 19990722; EP 1036908 A2 20000920; EP 1036908 A3 20020911; FR 2791084 A3 20000922; FR 2791084 B3 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KREYE, BERNARD

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI