Global Patent Index - EP 1036909 A2

EP 1036909 A2 2000-09-20 - Device for protection at a door

Title (en)

Device for protection at a door

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung an einer Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection à une porte

Publication

EP 1036909 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105067 A

Priority

SE 9900886 A

Abstract (en)

A longitudinal shield (7), to prevent crash damages on fingers or other parts of a human body, is elastically mounted on a doorblade (1) or a doorframe (2) at the side where the hinges (3) are provided for covering the interspace (4), which arises between the doorblade (1) and the doorframe (2) when the door is opened. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/367 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036909 A2 20000920; EP 1036909 A3 20030507; SE 9900886 D0 19990312

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031108

2004-03-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 3/88 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 7/36 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI