Global patent index - EP 1036911 A2

EP 1036911 A2 2000-09-20 - Closure and security grille for openings

Title (en)

Closure and security grille for openings

Title (de)

Verschluss- und Sicherheitsgitter für Öffnungen

Title (fr)

Grillage de fermeture et de sécurité pour ouvertures

Publication

EP 1036911 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105236 A

Priority

IT BO990115 A

Abstract (en)

The closure and security grille for openings includes: a stationary frame (4) formed by two vertical guide section bars (5d,5e), which are fastened to the vertical walls (55) of a related opening (60) and by a transverse bar (6) fastened thereto by locks; a stationary cross bar (Tf), connected with the transverse bar by a series of uprights of predetermined length; a series of moving cross bars, respectively lower (Ti), intermediate (T1,T2) and upper (Ts), whose extremities are slidably guided by the section bars; connecting means (8) for mutually connecting the lower, intermediate and upper moving cross bars as well as the upper moving cross bar to the stationary cross bar, the connecting means (8) defining, in combination with said cross bars, two extreme configurations, respectively an extended configuration (O), in which the cross bars are spaced apart with the lower moving cross bar (Ti) situated in proximity or in abutment on the lower wall of the opening (60), and a compacted configuration (I), in which the cross bars are drawn packed closed to each other against the stationary cross bar (Tf). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/063 (2013.01); E06B 9/0653 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036911 A2 20000920; EP 1036911 A3 20030402; IT 1309037 B1 20020115; IT BO990115 A1 20000911; IT BO990115 D0 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030503

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI