Global Patent Index - EP 1036919 A2

EP 1036919 A2 2000-09-20 - Internal combustion engine with an exhaust gas regulation device

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine with an exhaust gas regulation device

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit einer Abgasregelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne avec dispositif de réglage de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1036919 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103446 A

Priority

DE 19911338 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has a regulating device with a gas line (3) for connecting to at least one combustion chamber exhaust valve. The gas line contains a setting member (9) to alter the through flow cross section of the gas line. The position of the setting member is continuously adjusted by an electronic control apparatus (13).

Abstract (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit einer Abgasregelvorrichtung, die eine sich an wenigstens ein Auslaßventil am Brennraum anschließende Abgasleitung (3) aufweist, in der ein Stellglied (9) zur Änderung des Durchströmquerschnittes der Abgasleitung (3) angeordnet ist. Dabei ist die Lage des Stellgliedes (9) in der Abgasleitung (3) mittels eines Betriebsparameter der Brennkraftmaschine verarbeitenden elektronischen Steuergerätes (13) kontinuierlich einstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/16 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F02D 9/04 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/20 (2013.01); F01N 1/165 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F02D 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5279117 A 19940118 - KAISER FRIEDRICH W [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036919 A2 20000920; EP 1036919 A3 20001011; DE 19911338 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020202

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02D 9/04 A, 7F 01N 3/20 B, 7B 60K 41/06 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI