Global patent index - EP 1036980 A2

EP 1036980 A2 2000-09-20 - Lighting fixture for an elongated lamp

Title (en)

Lighting fixture for an elongated lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte für eine langgestreckte Lampe

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage pour une lampe allongée

Publication

EP 1036980 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105182 A

Priority

DE 19911347 A

Abstract (en)

The light unit has a lamp cover (3), which surrounds a fluorescent tube (2) on all sides, and holder casings (6) at each end of a light body (8) to hold the tube. The cover has an opening on each end, through which contact pins (4) at each end of the tube contact a contact mounting (7) in the light unit. A guide element (8) guides the end of the tube to the height of the contact mounting, from below.

Abstract (de)

Eine Leuchte (1) für eine langgestreckte Lampe (2) mit stirnseitigen Fassungsgehäusen (6), mit einer Lampenabdeckung (3), die die Lampe (2) allseitig umschließt, und stirnseitig eine Durchführungsöffnung aufweist, durch die hindurch ein mit Kontaktstiften (4) versehenes Ende der Lampe (2) in einer Kontaktfassung (7) kontaktierbar ist, ist zur Erleichterung des Auswechselns der Lampe (2) gekennzeichnet durch ein Führungselement (8) zum Führen des Endes der Lampe (2) von einer Unterseite der Lampenabdeckung auf die Höhe der Kontaktfassung (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/04; F21V 3/00; F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 3/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/015 (2006.01); F21V 17/06 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/031 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 15/015 (2013.01); F21V 17/06 (2013.01); F21V 19/008 (2013.01); F21V 19/04 (2013.01); F21V 14/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036980 A2 20000920; EP 1036980 A3 20020109; DE 19911347 A1 20000928; DE 19911347 B4 20041230

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051103

2004-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORKA NORDDEUTSCHE KUNSTSTOFF- UNDELEKTRO-GESELLSC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020316

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI