Global Patent Index - EP 1036987 A2

EP 1036987 A2 2000-09-20 - Safety gas valve with an electromagnet

Title (en)

Safety gas valve with an electromagnet

Title (de)

Sicherheitsgasventil mit einem Elektromagnet

Title (fr)

Soupape à gaz de sécurité avec un électro-aimant

Publication

EP 1036987 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500029 A

Priority

ES 9900547 A

Abstract (en)

The flame safety gas valve is built into a domestic tap and has an electromagnet (2), energised with DC voltage, and a moving armature (4a) with a valve sealing member (4) coupled, a seat (5) for supporting the core (11) connected to a ground (9) lead, and a connecting washer (7) with a central plug connected to phase (8) lead. The electromagnet (2) is built with a U-shaped core (11), which is linked to the connecting washer (7), and with two coils (12, 12') each wound on a respective semi-bobbin (13, 13'). The electromagnet is coupled (6,10,16,17) both electrically and mechanically to the safety gas valve. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/105 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0619460 A1 19941012 - ORKLI S COOP LTDA [ES]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1036987 A2 20000920; EP 1036987 A3 20020612; EP 1036987 B1 20040929; DE 60014217 D1 20041104; DE 60014217 T2 20051013; ES 2155016 A1 20010416; ES 2155016 B1 20011101; PT 1036987 E 20050131

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160228

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60014217

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060828

2006-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050201

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014217 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL PT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL PT

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI