Global patent index - EP 1036990 A2

EP 1036990 A2 2000-09-20 - Device for preparing food, in particular baking oven for steam cooking

Title (en)

Device for preparing food, in particular baking oven for steam cooking

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zubereiten von Speisen, insbesondere Dampfgargerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif à préparer de produits alimentaires, notamment four pour cuire à la vapeur

Publication

EP 1036990 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102144 A

Priority

DE 19906990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906990A1] A steam-cooking apparatus, especially steam-baking oven with a baking oven muffle, has a steam-cooking device for steam-cooking food in the cooking chamber of the apparatus. It comprises a lighting device located in the cooking chamber to illuminate the cooking chamber and/or a fan for the circulating air or heating air operation. The steam-cooking apparatus has a control device by which the lighting device and/or the fan can be controlled automatically for an operation of the steam-cooking apparatus with a minimal energy supply requirement for the cooking temperature.. The lighting device and/or the fan can be switched off, pulsed on and off or run with reduced power for an operation of the steam-cooking apparatus with a minimal energy supply requirement for the cooking temperature.

Abstract (de)

Bei Dampfgargeräten, insbesondere Dampfbacköfen mit einer Backofenmuffel, mit einer Beleuchtungseinrichtung zum Beleuchten des Garraums und/oder einem Ventilator für einen Umluft- oder Heißluftbetrieb besteht das Problem, daß bei niedrigen Betriebstemperaturen die Abwärme der Beleuchtungseinrichtung oder die von der mechanischen Leistung des Ventilators ausgehende Wärmezufuhr eine unerwünschte Temperaturerhöhung zur Folge hat und ferner die Genauigkeit und Konstanz der Temperaturregelung beeinträchtigen kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird zur Lösung dieses Problems vorgeschlagen, daß die Beleuchtungseinrichtung und/oder der Ventilator bei einem Betrieb des Dampfgargerätes mit geringem Engergiezufuhrbedarf für die Gartemperatur automatisch steuerbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/32; F24C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01); F24C 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/008 (2013.01); F24C 15/327 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906990 A1 20000824; EP 1036990 A2 20000920; EP 1036990 A3 20000927; EP 1036990 B1 20040901; ES 2226621 T3 20050401

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130208

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140408

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110208

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226621

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR PREPARING FOOD, IN PARTICULAR BAKING OVEN FOR STEAM COOKING

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021021

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI