Global Patent Index - EP 1036990 A3

EP 1036990 A3 2000-09-27 - Steam cooking device, in particular baking oven for steam cooking

Title (en)

Steam cooking device, in particular baking oven for steam cooking

Title (de)

Dampfgargerät, insbesondere Dampfbackofen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de cuisson à vapeur, notamment four pour cuire à la vapeur

Publication

EP 1036990 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102144 A

Priority

DE 19906990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906990A1] A steam-cooking apparatus, especially steam-baking oven with a baking oven muffle, has a steam-cooking device for steam-cooking food in the cooking chamber of the apparatus. It comprises a lighting device located in the cooking chamber to illuminate the cooking chamber and/or a fan for the circulating air or heating air operation. The steam-cooking apparatus has a control device by which the lighting device and/or the fan can be controlled automatically for an operation of the steam-cooking apparatus with a minimal energy supply requirement for the cooking temperature.. The lighting device and/or the fan can be switched off, pulsed on and off or run with reduced power for an operation of the steam-cooking apparatus with a minimal energy supply requirement for the cooking temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/32; F24C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01); F24C 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/008 (2013.01); F24C 15/327 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906990 A1 20000824; EP 1036990 A2 20000920; EP 1036990 A3 20000927; EP 1036990 B1 20040901; ES 2226621 T3 20050401

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130208

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140408

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110208

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226621 T3

2005-03-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007580 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2004-03-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR PREPARING FOOD, IN PARTICULAR BAKING OVEN FOR STEAM COOKING

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI