Global Patent Index - EP 1037001 A3

EP 1037001 A3 2000-10-04 - Apparatus for cooling the power electronis of a refrigeration compressor drive

Title (en)

Apparatus for cooling the power electronis of a refrigeration compressor drive

Title (de)

Gerät zum Kühlen der Leistungselektronik eines Kälteverdichterantriebs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour refroidir l'electronique de puissance d'un entraînement de compresseur frigorifique

Publication

EP 1037001 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200682 A

Priority

US 26857399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1037001A2] Apparatus for cooling the power electronics components (27) of a variable frequency drive for the motor of a refrigerant system compressor. The components are mounted upon a heat sink (30) and refrigerant from the system condenser (13) is passed through the heat sink (30) by means of a flow line (32) and returned to the low pressure side of the system. A control valve (40) is mounted in the flow line (32) which throttles refrigerant passing through the line to produce cooling of the heat sink (30) to maintain the temperature of the components within a desired range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 31/00; F04B 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/00 (2006.01); F04B 39/06 (2006.01); F25B 5/02 (2006.01); F25B 31/00 (2006.01); H01L 23/427 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 5/02 (2013.01); F04B 39/06 (2013.01); F25B 31/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037001 A2 20000920; EP 1037001 A3 20001004; EP 1037001 B1 20040915; AU 2228300 A 20000921; AU 766412 B2 20031016; CN 1134628 C 20040114; CN 1266978 A 20000920; DE 60013666 D1 20041021; DE 60013666 T2 20050929; ES 2223388 T3 20050301; JP 2000283569 A 20001013; SG 84572 A1 20011120; TW M267436 U 20050611; US 6116040 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150401

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2223388 T3

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013666 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030128

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI