Global Patent Index - EP 1037004 A1

EP 1037004 A1 2000-09-20 - Apparatus and process for gas mixture separation at low temperature

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for gas mixture separation at low temperature

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Zerlegung eines Gasgemischs bei niedriger Temperatur

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour séparer un mélange de gaz à basse température

Publication

EP 1037004 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105042 A

Priority

  • EP 00105042 A
  • DE 19911909 A
  • EP 99113350 A

Abstract (en)

A plant for separation of a gas mixture at low temperature, has a fractionating column, a heat exchanger unit, a gas line, a gas / liquid separator, two liquid lines, a condensate return line, a line feeding into the main heat exchanger and a line feeding cooled gas into the column. A plant for separation of a gas mixture at low temperature, has a fractionating column (3), a heat exchanger unit (50) , comprising a main exchanger section (51) and a condenser/ evaporator section (52), having separate flow channels for the respective condensation and evaporation sides (54,55), a first line (1) feeding into the main heat exchanger (51), a second line (2) feeding cooled gas into the column (5), a first liquid line (7,9,312) connecting the column bottoms to the evaporator inlet (55), a gas line (4) for taking the column overheads to the condenser inlet (54), a condensate return line (5) from the condenser section (52,54) to the upper section of the column, a gas / liquid separator (56,56a,56b) connected to the outlet (55) of the evaporator section (52), and a second liquid line (58,58a,58b,316a,316b) connecting the separator (56,56a,56b) to the evaporator inlet, and provided with a flush connection (317a,317b,61). Preferred Features: The bottoms fraction (9) is only partially evaporated (55) and separated (56,56a,56b) from the residual liquid phase (58,58a,58b), down stream of the evaporation section (55) and piped back (316a,316b) to the condenser / evaporator section (52).

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung und das Verfahren dienen zur Zerlegung eines Gasgemischs bei niedriger Temperatur. Die Vorrichtung enthält eine Trennsäule (3) und einen Wärmetauscherblock (50), der einen Hauptwärmetauscherabschnitt (51) und einen Kondensator-Verdampfer-Abschnitt (52) aufweist, Der Kondensator-Verdampfer-Abschnitt (52) weist Verdampfungspassagen (55) und Kondensationspassagen (54) auf. Eine erste Einsatzgasleitung (1) dient zur Zuführung von Einsatzgas zum Hauptwärmetauscherabschnitt (51). Über eine zweite Einsatzgasleitung(2) wird abgekühltes Einsatzgas in die Trennsäule (3) geführt. Eine erste Flüssigkeitsleitung (7, 9) führt vom unteren Bereich der Trennsäule (3) zum Eintritt der Verdampfungspassagen (55). Eine Gasleitung (4) führt vom oberen Bereich der Trennsäule (3) zu den Kondensationspassagen (54). Eine Rücklaufleitung (5) dient zur Einführung von in den Kondensationspassagen gebildetem Kondensat in den oberen Bereich der Trennsäule (3). Es ist eine Phasentrenneinrichtung (56) vorgesehen, die mit dem Austritt der Verdampfungspassagen (55) verbunden ist. Eine zweite Flüssigkeitsleitung (58) führt von der Phasentrenneinrichtung (56) zum Eintritt der Verdampfungspassagen (55) und ist außerdem mit einer Spülleitung (61) verbunden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04; F25J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04236 (2013.01); F25J 3/04254 (2013.01); F25J 3/04284 (2013.01); F25J 3/044 (2013.01); F25J 5/002 (2013.01); F25J 2200/72 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2210/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/02 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01); F25J 2290/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037004 A1 20000920; EP 1037004 B1 20030806

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080303

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE A.G.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204380 T3

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-01-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-11-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003157 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI