Global Patent Index - EP 1037104 A1

EP 1037104 A1 2000-09-20 - Digital image forming process and silver halide color photographic material

Title (en)

Digital image forming process and silver halide color photographic material

Title (de)

Numerisches Bilderzeugungsverfahren und farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial

Title (fr)

Procédé de formation d'image numérique et matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent

Publication

EP 1037104 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200989 A

Priority

  • EP 00200989 A
  • EP 99200850 A
  • EP 99202188 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is directed to an image formation process, said process including the development of an exposed color photographic material and the output of the image information to a printer, wherein said process comprises; (1) photoelectric reading of the recorded image information on the said developed color photographic material, (2) the conversion of the image information obtained by said photoelectric reading into a digital image information, (3) providing said digital image information with digital image processing so that preferable image characteristics can be obtained, and (4) output said information on an output material with a printer, said color photographic material further being characterised in that after development under standard conditions. (5) for the yellow, magenta, and cyan colors the value of the maximum transmittance, Tmax, is 0.5 or more, and T1-T0 is -0.15 or more, and 0.3 or less. said value being defined on the basis of the characteristic curve of the said color photographic material shown in a rectangular co-ordinate system, whose vertical axis shows the transmittance of the said developed photographic material and the horizontal axis shows the logarithm of the light exposure, the point A on the characteristic curve is defined at a transmittance of (Tmax - 0.03), Ea is defined as the value of logarithm of the light exposure at the point A, the point B on the characteristic curve is defined at a transmittance of (Tmin + 0.03) (Tmin is the minimum transmittance), Eb is defined as the value of logarithm of the light exposure at the point B, the transmittance value which corresponds to (Ea + Eb)/2 on the straight line AB is defined as T0, and the transmittance value which corresponds to (Ea + Eb)/2 on the said characteristic curve is defined as T1. (6) said color photographic material has at least one layer which contains the dye forming coupler and the silver halide, whose silver/coupler ratio is 150 mol/mol or more and 2000 mol/mol or less

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/3041 (2013.01); G03C 7/3022 (2013.01); G03C 7/3029 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 7/3022 + G03C 2007/3024 + G03C 2007/3027
  2. G03C 7/3029 + G03C 2200/30 + G03C 2007/3034
  3. G03C 7/3041 + G03C 2007/3031

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037104 A1 20000920; EP 1037104 B1 20050309

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070317

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070317

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018494 P 20050414

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040317

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI