Global Patent Index - EP 1037169 A2

EP 1037169 A2 2000-09-20 - Method and device for inputting an indicia to a franking machine

Title (en)

Method and device for inputting an indicia to a franking machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Eingabe eines Druckbildes in eine Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'entrée d'image de marquage dans une machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 1037169 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250054 A

Priority

DE 19913066 A

Abstract (en)

The print stamp data input method uses input of data supplied from a manufacturer's databank containing data for a range of different print stamp images, entered in a read-only memory of the franking machine by the manufacturer, with subsequent configuration dependent on the location at which the franking machine is installed, using data received from an input interface, e.g. by insertion of a chip card (49) in a chip card reader. An Independent claim for print stamp input device for a mail franking machine is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung und Verfahren zur Druckstempeleingabe in eine Frankiermaschine, wobei ein Poststempelbild zunächst unvollständig vorinstalliert wird. In einer Datenbank des Herstellers sind die Poststempeldruckbilddaten für eine Auswahl mindestens nach Postbeförderer und/oder Ländern geordnet und können der Seriennummer zugeordnet werden. Die Frankiermaschinen-Seriennummer wird in einem davon getrennten Schrift eingegeben. Bei Bedarf können mittels einer speziellen länder- und/oder befördererspezifischen Chipkarte Daten eingeladen oder ausgewählt werden, um die Frankiermaschine abschließend zu konfigurieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00387 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037169 A2 20000920; EP 1037169 A3 20010131; DE 19913066 A1 20000921; US 7133849 B1 20061107

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20080806

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI