Global Patent Index - EP 1037171 A3

EP 1037171 A3 2001-01-31 - Postage value determining device and franking machine

Title (en)

Postage value determining device and franking machine

Title (de)

Portowertermittlungseinrichtung und Frankiereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déterminer la valeur postale et machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 1037171 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102591 A

Priority

DE 19911514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1037171A2] The postage cost calculation device has at least 2 operating modes, in each of which the postage cost is calculated by a microprocessor (5) using respective postal charge tables. The different tables hold a different number of postal rates and are addressed by different input data combinations. An Independent claim for a mail franking machine is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0037 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00483 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037171 A2 20000920; EP 1037171 A3 20010131; DE 19911514 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI