Global patent index - EP 1037172 A2

EP 1037172 A2 2000-09-20 - Method for the automatic installation of franking machines and apparatus for carrying out said method

Title (en)

Method for the automatic installation of franking machines and apparatus for carrying out said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur automatischen Installation von Frankiereinrichtungen und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'installation automatique de machines à affranchir et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1037172 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250053 A

Priority

DE 19913067 A

Abstract (en)

The automatic installation method uses storage of machine data within the franking machine during its manufacture and storage of a similar set of machine data together with a number code within a data center, which is supplied with customer data upon purchase of the franking machine, for combining with the corresponding machine data and the number code, before forwarding the latter to the franking location upon reception of a data request. An Independent claim for a device for automatic installation of a mail franking machine is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Frankiereinrichtung ist für einen Selbsttest programmiert, festzustellen, ob eine automatische Installation durchzuführen und ein Laden eines kundenspezifischen Datensatzes in einen nichtflüchtigen Speicher vorzunehmen oder im Falle einer bereits früher erfolgten Installation nicht durchzuführen ist. Das Verfahren zur automatischen Installation weist die Schritte auf: a) Speichern eines den in die Frankiereinrichtung eingespeicherten Maschinendaten entsprechenden Spiegeldatensatz zugeordnet einem Nummerncode in der Datenzentrale, b) Übermitteln von erfaßten Kundendaten einer verkauften Frankiereinrichtung zur Datenzentrale, c) Speichern der Kundendaten in der Datenzentrale zugeordnet zum Nummerncode, d) Bereitstellen eines maschinen- und kundenspezifischen Datensatzes in der Datenzentrale zugeordnet zum Nummerncode, wobei der Datensatz mindestens Daten für einen spezifischen Stempel mit temporären und lokalen Daten umfaßt, und e) Übermitteln des Datensatzes zum Frankierort nach einem Empfang entsprechender Anforderungsdaten oder Eingaben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037172 A2 20000920; EP 1037172 A3 20010131; EP 1037172 B1 20080702; DE 19913067 A1 20000921; DE 50015229 D1 20080814; US 6775656 B1 20040810

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50015229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-03-21 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 50015229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130124

2009-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI