Global Patent Index - EP 1037177 A2

EP 1037177 A2 2000-09-20 - Process to adapt a money changer for a coin-actuated vending machine from the national currency to the Euro

Title (en)

Process to adapt a money changer for a coin-actuated vending machine from the national currency to the Euro

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Umstellung eines Geldwechslers für Münzautomaten von einer nationalen auf die Euro-Währung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour adapter un changeur de monnaie pour automate à pièces de monnaie de la monnaie nationale vers l'Euro

Publication

EP 1037177 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113747 A

Priority

  • DE 19857500 A
  • EP 99114485 A

Abstract (en)

The currency changing machine has the facility to accept a national currency and apply a conversion into Euro currency. The money is entered and is passed through a checking unit before being sorted into denominations. The conversion is made by a programmed microprocessor. The system has a several magazines for storage of the money.

Abstract (de)

Geldwechsler für Münzautomaten für die Annahme von Münzen von einer nationalen und der Euro-Währung, wobei der Geldwechsler folgende Merkmale aufweist: eine einem Münzprüfer nachgeordnete Sortiervorrichtung, drei oder vier Münztuben für die Aufnahme von Münzen unterschiedlicher Wertigkeit, eine Auszahlvorrichtung für die Ausgabe von Münzen aus den Münztuben, mindestens einen Mikroprozessor, der eine Auswertevorrichtung für die vom Münzprüfer kommenden, den Münzen entsprechenden Münzsignale aufweist, einen Sortiersteuerblock zur Ansteuerung der Sortiervorrichtung, welche Münzen vorgegebenen Wertes in vorgegebene Tuben lenkt und übrige Münzen in eine Kasse, gegebenenfalls einen Preisblock, in dem der Wert der eingeworfenen Münzen mit einem voreingestellten Preis verglichen wird, einen Auszahlsteuerblock, der die Auszahlvorrichtung ansteuert zur Ausgabe der Münzen aus den Münztuben, wenn der Wert der eingeworfenen Münzen den voreingestellten Preis übersteigt, gegebenenfalls einen Display-Steuerblock zur Ansteuerung einer Anzeige für den Betrag der eingeworfenen Münzen, wobei, die Auswertevorrichtung für die nationale Währung und die Euro-Münzsignale programmiert oder programmierbar ist und wahlweise in Abhängigkeit von der angewählten Währung (Basis-Währung) eine Umrechnung oder Bewertung aus der nicht angewählten Währung in die gewählte durchführt, einen Wahlschalter zur wahlweisen Aktivierung der nationalen Währung oder der Euro-Währung in der Auswertevorrichtung bzw. eines ansteuerbaren Bereichs zur Aktivierung der Basis-Währung in der Auswertevorrichtung, und wobei mindestens zwei Münztuben so ausgelegt sind, daß jeweils Münzen der nationalen Währung bzw. Euro-Münzen speicherbar sind und das im Sortiersteuerblock enthaltene Programm derart ausgebildet ist, daß am Stichtag oder danach die Sortiervorrichtung die nationale Münze in die Kasse lenkt und die Sortierung von Euro-Münzen in die zumindest zwei Münztuben freigibt, sobald ein entsprechender Leerstandsmelder meldet, daß eine der zumindest zwei Münztuben von nationalen Münzen leer ist, wobei die Umschaltungen am Stichtag oder danach manuell, durch einen Zeit- oder Datumsgeber ausgelöst werden oder durch Mittel, die ein Ereignis registrieren, z. B. das erste Auftauchen einer Euro-Münze, das Auftauchen einer Mehrzahl von Euro-Münzen oder einer bestimmten Kombination von Euro-Münzen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 5/24; G07D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/02 (2006.01); G07D 1/04 (2006.01); G07F 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 5/24 (2013.01); G07D 1/02 (2013.01); G07D 1/04 (2013.01); G07D 2205/0011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014315 A1 20000628; EP 1014315 B1 20020109; AT 211843 T 20020115; AT 218730 T 20020615; DE 19857500 C1 20000511; EP 1037177 A2 20000920; EP 1037177 A3 20010627; EP 1037177 B1 20020605; ES 2168825 T3 20020616; ES 2174788 T3 20021116; PT 1014315 E 20020628; PT 1037177 E 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901614

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100908

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NATIONAL REJECTORS INC. G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NATIONAL REJECTORS INC. G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-09 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-09 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-08 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-09-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901614 20020711

2002-07-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1014315

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218730 T 20020615

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MONEY CHANGER FOR A COIN-ACTUATED VENDING MACHINE FOR THE TRANSITION FROM A NATIONAL CURRENCY TO THE EURO

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-09-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1014315

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI