Global patent index - EP 1037181 A2

EP 1037181 A2 2000-09-20 - Method and system for monitoring an interior

Title (en)

Method and system for monitoring an interior

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Überwachen eines Innenraums

Title (fr)

Méthode et système de surveillance d'un espace intérieur

Publication

EP 1037181 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105069 A

Priority

DE 19911108 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method and a system for monitoring an interior. For detecting an object 3 trespassing into the interior a picture of the interior is compared with a previously taken background image showing the interior from the same angle when it is not disturbed by any trespassing object. A detecting means 30 takes a decision for detecting an object 3 trespassing into said interior in the case that there is a shadow 4', 4'' caused by said trespassed object 3 in the picture covering at least a section of said interior. In order to reduce the effort for detecting the object 3 trespassing into the interior the present invention proposes not to evaluate shadows in any part of the picture but only that shadows which cover at least a part of a predetermined relevant area of the interior through which trespassing of an object is most likely expected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/194

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/194 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19602 (2013.01); G08B 13/19604 (2013.01); G08B 13/19641 (2013.01); G08B 13/19647 (2013.01); G08B 13/19652 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037181 A2 20000920; EP 1037181 A3 20050119

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI