Global Patent Index - EP 1037182 A2

EP 1037182 A2 2000-09-20 - Anti-theft element in an anti-theft device

Title (en)

Anti-theft element in an anti-theft device

Title (de)

Antidiebstallelement in einer Antidiebstallvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Elément antivol dans un dispositif antivol

Publication

EP 1037182 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102808 A

Priority

SE 9900964 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an anti-theft element in an anti-theft device which is intended to be attached to a theft-attractive article such that said device can only be removed from the article with the aid of a special release device. The anti-theft element includes a fouling-substance ampule which contains a fouling substance and which is disposed in the anti-theft element so as to be broken, crushed or otherwise destroyed or opened so as to release said fouling substance if an attempt is made to release the anti-theft device from the theft-attractive article without the aid of said special release device. The ampule (2) encloses a first fouling substance (B; D; G) having a specific fouling property, and at least one second fouling substance (C; E, F; H) having a fouling property which differs from the fouling property of the first fouling substance (B; D; G). The chemical composition of the respective first fouling substance (B; D; G) and of said second fouling substance (C; E, F; H) is such that the fouling substances (B, D, G; C, E, F, H) will not dissolve in one another. The invention also relates to a fouling-substance ampule intended for inclusion in an anti-theft element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; G08B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/24 (2006.01); G08B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2434 (2013.01); E05B 73/0017 (2013.01); G08B 13/2437 (2013.01); G08B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 39/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037182 A2 20000920; EP 1037182 A3 20010411; EP 1037182 B1 20030924; AU 2082500 A 20000921; AU 762774 B2 20030703; CA 2298143 A1 20000917; DE 60005428 D1 20031030; DE 60005428 T2 20040722; ES 2204371 T3 20040501; JP 2000285329 A 20001013; SE 513779 C2 20001106; SE 9900964 D0 19990317; SE 9900964 L 20000918

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070211

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070212

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070212

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070211

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070211

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204371 T3

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005428 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI