Global Patent Index - EP 1037184 A1

EP 1037184 A1 2000-09-20 - Casing for hazard warning device

Title (en)

Casing for hazard warning device

Title (de)

Gehäuse für einen Gefahrenmelder

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour avertisseur de danger

Publication

EP 1037184 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104593 A

Priority

EP 99104593 A

Abstract (en)

The base (1) of the housing has a strip-shaped region (15) which is surrounded by weak-points and has several screw points (16) for attachment by screws to a wall. The strip-shaped region has a strut (17) which extends up to the lid (2) of the housing. The strut closes a contact switch (19) mounted in the lid when the housing is closed. The strip-shaped region may extend cross-wise across the base (1) and have different screw points may allow different mounting e.g. in a wall or in a corner.

Abstract (de)

Das Gehäuse enthält einen zur Befestigung an einer Wand vorgesehene Boden (1), einen lösbar mit dem Boden (1) verbindbaren Deckel (2) und einen Sabotagedetektor zur Auslösung eines Alarms bei gewaltsamer Entfernung des Gefahrenmelders von der Wand. Der Boden (1) enthält einen streifenfömigen, von Schwachstellen umrandeten Bereich (15) mit mehren Einschraubstellen (16) für eine Befestigungsschraube. Dieser streifenförmige Bereich (15) weist einen gegen den Deckel (2) ragenden Steg (17) auf, welcher mit seinem freien Ende bei geschlossenem Gehäuse einen im Deckel (2) montierten Kontaktschalter (19) schliesst. Bei Abreissen des Gehäuses von der Wand wird der streifenförmige Bereich (15) aus dem Boden (1) herausgebrochen und verbleibt an der Wand, wodurch der Kontaktschalter (19) geöffnet wird. Der Kontaktschalter (19) wird ausserdem bei unbefugter Abnahme des Deckels (2) vom Boden (1) geöffnet und wirkt daher sowohl als Abreiss- als auch als Deckelkontakt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037184 A1 20000920; EP 1037184 B1 20031029; DE 59907541 D1 20031204; US 6297745 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160308

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160308

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907541

2016-01-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VANDERBILT INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59907541

2016-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907541

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150305

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150303

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140308

2015-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-04-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110318

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#BELLERIVESTRASSE 36#8034 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907541 P 20031204

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI