Global Patent Index - EP 1037194 A1

EP 1037194 A1 2000-09-20 - Method for generating the sound of a switching electromechanical relay

Title (en)

Method for generating the sound of a switching electromechanical relay

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung des Schaltungsklanges eines elektromechanischen Relais

Title (fr)

Procédé pour engendrer un bruit de commutation de relais électromécanique

Publication

EP 1037194 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400727 A

Priority

FR 9903209 A

Abstract (en)

The indicator switching noise mechanism has a loudspeaker (4) drive from a drive circuit (1). The drive circuit has different frequency signals (131-134) so that different signals can be set one after the other and at rhythm which can be sent out by the loudspeaker producing a sound during relay switching.

Abstract (fr)

Pour engendrer un bruit de commutation de relais électromécanique à bord d'un véhicule, on excite un transducteur électro-acoustique (4) à l'aide d'un circuit d'excitation (1) produisant une pluralité de signaux à diverses fréquences (131-134) et on commande le circuit d'excitation (1) pour engendrer les divers signaux l'un après l'autre et à un rythme suffisamment élevé pour que chaque fréquence restituée par le transducteur (4) soit interrompue avant qu'elle ne devienne une note. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10H 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037194 A1 20000920; FR 2791165 A1 20000922; FR 2791165 B1 20010504

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040515

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON CONTROLS AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-06-27 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI