Global Patent Index - EP 1037216 A1

EP 1037216 A1 2000-09-20 - Manufacturing of telecom - cables with wire groups having different lays

Title (en)

Manufacturing of telecom - cables with wire groups having different lays

Title (de)

Telekomkabelherstellung mit Metalldrahtgruppen mit verschiedenen Schlägen

Title (fr)

Fabrication de câble de télécommunication avec des groupes de fils métalliques ayant des pas différents

Publication

EP 1037216 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400266 A

Priority

FR 9903276 A

Abstract (en)

The twisted pair composite cable (CP) has groups of twisted pairs (P1-P4) following different paths inside a cable outer. The metal graphic state of each of the metal wires in all the twisted pair groups is identical.

Abstract (fr)

Un câble de télécommunication par exemple de paires résulte d'étapes de fabriquer des fils conducteurs isolés (F1, F2) avec des fils métalliques ayant subi au moins un recuit et un gainage, de torsader (LYP) les fils conducteurs isolés en paires de fils torsadés ayant des pas différents (p), et d'assembler les paires en les torsadant ensemble pour constituer ledit câble. Des états métallographiques (EM4) sont imposés aux paires de fils métalliques par exemple entre des bobines de fil (BF1, BF2) et une lyre de paireuse (LYP) afin de compenser des différences d'états métallographiques de fils (EM5) entre les paires de fils (P1-P4) à l'étape de torsader les fils en groupes et conférer des états métallographiques sensiblement identiques à tous les fils métalliques du câble fabriqué et ainsi une meilleure paradiaphonie entre les paires dans le câble. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/02; H01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/02 (2006.01); H01B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/0292 (2013.01); H01B 11/02 (2013.01); H01B 13/0285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037216 A1 20000920; EP 1037216 B1 20040506; DE 60010359 D1 20040609; DE 60010359 T2 20050504; ES 2216832 T3 20041101; FR 2790862 A1 20000915; FR 2790862 B1 20010504

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2011-12-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111219

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100128

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-12-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-10-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-07-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-07-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216832 T3

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010359 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM S.A.

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI