Global Patent Index - EP 1037224 A2

EP 1037224 A2 2000-09-20 - Push switch

Title (en)

Push switch

Title (de)

Tastschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à bouton poussoir

Publication

EP 1037224 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00105078 A

Priority

JP 6559899 A

Abstract (en)

A structure of a stem in a push switch is provided which can ensure a sufficient engaging strength of hook portions of the stem even if the hook portions are not equal in wall thickness and which can reduce the size of the entire stem. The push switch comprises a box-shaped housing a, a pair of fixed terminals fixed within the housing 1, a stem 5 held slidably by inner side faces of the housing 1, a movable contact 3 disposed above the fixed terminals 2 so as to be operable in interlock with movement of the stem 5, and a rubber spring 4 which causes the movable contact 3 to move into contact with and away from the fixed terminals 2 and which causes the stem to return. The stem 5 is formed with hook portions having retaining portions respectively for engagement with retaining grooves formed in the inner side faces of the housing, the hook portions 5d being respectively formed with relief portions on sides thereof opposed to the rubber spring 4 to receive therein bent portions of the rubber spring. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/52 (2006.01); H01H 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/14 (2013.01); H01H 2207/032 (2013.01); H01H 2215/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1037224 A2 20000920; EP 1037224 A3 20010829; EP 1037224 B1 20050525; CN 1129156 C 20031126; CN 1267070 A 20000920; DE 60020284 D1 20050630; DE 60020284 T2 20051124; JP 2000260257 A 20000922; JP 3762564 B2 20060405; TW 436831 B 20010528

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070310

2006-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020284

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI